Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2148 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15554 Week
» 68570 Month
» 188097 Year
» 3214950 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2076 |
m/e |
03/1910 |
British Railways |
32076 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Marsh Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 03/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 09/12/1950 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1910 |
BA |
|
Bricklayers Arms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
BTN |
|
Brighton |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/12/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
m/e |
30/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
BTN |
Brighton |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/12/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
01/02/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops:-Nos. 21C101, CC2, 34004/05/20, 34061 73 Squadron, 34062/65, 2039/76/89, 2325, 2489, 2514, 32339, 32520 an 77062/94, for repair. Two 'Leader' Class under construction. No. 34090 left shops on 31/1 named Sir Eustace Missenden, Southern Railway Battle of Britain Class, the S.R. Coat-of-arms is also incorporated in the nameplate, the background of which is painted Air Force blue. The locomotive is painted malachite green with yellow lining, but the wheel centres instead of being black are also green and the tyres yellow. The British Railways crest is on the tender. |
SLS/194903 |
07/03/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops included Nos. 82 Boxhill, 2023/30/37/39/76/89, 2113, S2343, 2449, 32086, 34001 Exeter, 34003/61, 73790, 77056, 77180, 21C107 Wadebridge. |
SLS/194904 |
31/01/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
ex Works: Blue, 35017/26/28; dark green, 30752, 30858, 34009/17/26/44/51/53/88/89; lined black, 30050, 30117/28, 30285/8, 30482, 30707/58 Lord St. Levan, 30909/28. B.4 dock tanks 30096/102 have lost their names on repainting. No. 32425 has been repaired here, also 32151 (lined black), 32331/7, 32558. The I.3 tank, 32076, appears to be waiting scrap. |
SLS/195103 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2076 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32076 |
|
|
09/12/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32076 |
|
|
02/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|