Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 908 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14314 Week
» 67330 Month
» 186857 Year
» 3213710 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1617 |
m/e |
10/1928 |
British Railways |
31617 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 05/01/1964 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1617 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31617 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
13/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
20/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
05/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31617 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|