Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 257 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14300 Week
» 79254 Month
» 281918 Year
» 3308771 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
957 |
m/e |
08/1929 |
British Railways |
30957 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Z |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-8-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 08/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/11/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
2w/e |
13/10/1958 |
ALLOC |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
7w/e |
01/05/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/03/1953 |
Brighton Works |
No. 80059, the first of ten new 2-6-4 tanks left the works on 3rd March; a further ten are also to be built in this 'year's programme. Engines under and awaiting repair include 30027, 30109, 30825/37, 30338, 30951/7, 32655. 30117 an 30919 have been through shops but have not been repainted. While DS515 was receiving attention here its place at Lancing was taken by 32636; 80060 was due on 2/3 but was not ready. An unusual visitor to the shed on 3rd March was 32113. |
SLS/195304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 957 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30957 |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
01/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30957 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|