Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 803 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18606 Week
» 71622 Month
» 191149 Year
» 3218002 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
954 |
m/e |
09/1929 |
British Railways |
30954 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Z |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-8-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/12/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/05/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops : 30066, (300)68, 30082/331/56/74/477/90/7, 30501/30/77/84/783/90/7/829/920/33/54, 34002/6/7/30/49/79/99/103, 35019, also 2101 with large numerals on tanks as pre-war, and 2138, renumbered 32138 on one side only. Being cut up: (30)305/414. Still waiting to be cut up: (30)116. Ex shops: 30061/197/470/570/89/781, 34055, 35010. |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 954 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30954 |
|
|
17/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
01/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (71H) |
|
|
19/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30954 |
|
|
02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|