Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 479 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19390 Week
» 84344 Month
» 287008 Year
» 3313861 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E6024 |
03/1966 |
TOPS (Tops) |
73118 |
01/01/1973 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
08/05/1987 |
The Romney Hythe and Dymchurch Railway |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E6024 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
14/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D) |
|
|
01/01/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 73118 |
|
|
04/08/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Ramsgate (RE) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Stewarts Lane (SL) |
|
|
08/05/1987 |
Naming |
Named 'The Romney Hythe and Dymchurch Railway' by Brian Johnstone OBE (BBC circket commentator) at Folkestone Harbour station |
|
|