Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 99 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2006 Week
» 20788 Month
» 269081 Year
» 1153462 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS E6013 12/1965
TOPS 73107 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class 73
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 12/1965
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 09/07/1967
75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 14/06/1968


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1965 To Service To service as E6013
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
   
09/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
14/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
27/07/1969 Sightings Crewe Works visit: New erecting shop RO 9/1969 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 73107    

prev prev