Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3139 |
26/01/1966 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86043 |
21/12/1973 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86257 |
14/05/1975 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
26/01/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/2002 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
03/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
26/01/1966 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/01/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3139 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
21/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86043 |
|
|
14/05/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86257 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
11/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86257 |
|
|
01/11/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Easco: at Immingham Railfreight Terminal |
|
|