Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 335 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18138 Week
» 71154 Month
» 190681 Year
» 3217534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3135 |
21/01/1966 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86040 |
01/01/1973 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86256 |
24/03/1975 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
21/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
10/2002 |
Time in Service |
36 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys |
Cut Up |
01/03/2006 |
Cut At |
Ron Hull Jr. Rotherham |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
21/01/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/2002 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
21/01/1966 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/01/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3135 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
01/01/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86040 |
|
|
24/03/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86256 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
10/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86256 |
|
|
01/03/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|