Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2785 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16191 Week
» 69207 Month
» 188734 Year
» 3215587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3118 |
25/09/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86041 |
25/10/1973 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86261 |
01/08/1975 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
25/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
11/2002 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys |
Cut Up |
01/12/2004 |
Cut At |
C F Booth Rotherham |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
25/09/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/2002 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
25/09/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3118 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
25/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86041 |
|
|
01/08/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86261 |
|
|
11/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86261 |
|
|
01/12/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|