Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4247 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17653 Week
» 70669 Month
» 190196 Year
» 3217049 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3112 |
24/08/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86006 |
27/06/1973 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86406 |
01/05/1986 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86606 |
07/10/1990 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
24/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
11/2003 |
Time in Service |
38 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys |
Cut Up |
01/06/2007 |
Cut At |
Ron Hull Jr. Rotherham |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
24/08/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3112 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
27/06/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86006 |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GS) |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
01/05/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86406 |
|
|
07/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86606 |
|
|
11/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86606 |
|
|
01/06/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|