Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2974 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16380 Week
» 69396 Month
» 188923 Year
» 3215776 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3076 |
20/04/1963 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85021 |
01/10/1973 |
TOPS (85/1) |
85106 |
14/07/1989 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
20/04/1963 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/04/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3076 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
01/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85021 |
|
|
02/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
14/07/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85106 |
|
|
01/10/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85106 |
|
|
01/09/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|