Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3131 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16537 Week
» 69553 Month
» 189080 Year
» 3215933 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3069 |
19/05/1962 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85014 |
05/1974 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
19/05/1962 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
08/12/1971 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3069 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
08/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85014 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
16/10/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85014 |
|
|
29/09/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|