Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2928 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16334 Week
» 69350 Month
» 188877 Year
» 3215730 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3064 |
26/11/1961 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85009 |
07/1974 |
TOPS (85/1) |
85102 |
18/06/1989 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/04/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
26/11/1961 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
26/04/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3064 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
26/04/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85009 |
|
|
18/06/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85102 |
|
|
01/05/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85102 |
|
|
01/09/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|