Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1208 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19011 Week
» 72027 Month
» 191554 Year
» 3218407 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3062 |
07/12/1961 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85007 |
14/11/1973 |
TOPS (85/1) |
85112 |
12/03/1990 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
22/03/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
07/12/1961 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
22/03/1971 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/12/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3062 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
22/03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
14/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85007 |
|
|
12/03/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85112 |
|
|
01/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85112 |
|
|
01/12/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|