Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1400 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19203 Week
» 72219 Month
» 191746 Year
» 3218599 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3058 |
03/06/1961 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85003 |
31/08/1973 |
TOPS (85/1) |
85113 |
01/10/1990 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
85 |
Rebuild History |
Class | From | 85 | 03/06/1961 | 85/1 | 01/10/1990 |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
03/06/1961 |
To Service At |
London Midland - Western Lines (LMW) |
Withdrawn |
01/11/1991 |
Time in Service |
30 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
Cut Up |
01/12/1992 |
Cut At |
MC Metals Springburn |
Information |
The official card for E3058 shows the locomotive allocated to Woodford Halse and Wellingborough! This was an uncorrected admin error and should have applied to D3058!
|
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
03/06/1961 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3058 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
31/08/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85003 |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GS) |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Electric (CE) |
|
|
01/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85113 |
|
|
01/11/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85113 |
|
|
01/12/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|