Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 33 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 18944 Week
» 83898 Month
» 286562 Year
» 3313415 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8598 |
06/08/1964 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/08/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/08/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8598 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
07/11/1971 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
25/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
31/12/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8598 from Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
03/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|