Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2304 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20107 Week
» 73123 Month
» 192650 Year
» 3219503 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7657 |
04/07/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25307 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (25/9) |
25908 |
14/12/1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
04/07/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
31/12/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/07/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
31/12/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
09/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/07/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7657 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
07/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
31/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
09/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25307 |
|
|
09/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
09/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
14/12/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25908 |
|
|
01/11/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25908 |
|
|
08/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|