Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17937 Week
» 70953 Month
» 190480 Year
» 3217333 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7654 |
24/06/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25304 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
24/06/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/06/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
07/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/06/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7654 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
05/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
15/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25304 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
28/11/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25304 |
|
|
17/08/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|