Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1388 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 12603 Week
» 3659 Month
» 350083 Year
» 3376936 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7579 |
13/12/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25229 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 02/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/12/1963 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
13/12/1963 |
Power Unit VA777 |
|
|
|
13/12/1963 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21182 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/12/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7579 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
04/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
08/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25229 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
20/05/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25229 |
|
|
30/09/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|