Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 891 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14297 Week
» 67313 Month
» 186840 Year
» 3213693 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7099 |
22/01/1964 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
22/01/1964 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7099 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 8003 Allocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
10/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|
05/10/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7099 from Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|