Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 335 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18138 Week
» 71154 Month
» 190681 Year
» 3217534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7089 |
23/07/1963 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
23/07/1963 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7089 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7993 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
28/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
08/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/05/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7089 from Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
02/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|