Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1975 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15381 Week
» 68397 Month
» 187924 Year
» 3214777 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7029 |
17/04/1962 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
35 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
BP3040 |
Works Number |
7923 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
17/04/1962 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Withdrawn |
28/02/1975 |
Time in Service |
12 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
17/04/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
02/03/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/04/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
03/1974 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
02/03/1974 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7029 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7923 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
19/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/01/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
03/02/1975 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
28/02/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7029 |
|
|