Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 665 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14071 Week
» 67087 Month
» 186614 Year
» 3213467 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7011 |
04/12/1961 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
35 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
BP3040 |
Works Number |
7905 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
04/12/1961 to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
Withdrawn |
02/03/1975 |
Time in Service |
13 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys |
Cut Up |
01/1977 |
Cut At |
Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over green with light green skirting, white window surrounds |
04/12/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
02/03/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/12/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
03/1974 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
02/03/1974 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/12/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7011 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7905 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/01/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
02/03/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7011 |
|
|
01/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Marples and Gillot: Sheffield |
|
|