Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 365 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18168 Week
» 71184 Month
» 190711 Year
» 3217564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7000 |
16/05/1961 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
35 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
BP3040 |
Works Number |
7894 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
16/05/1961 to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
Withdrawn |
30/07/1973 |
Time in Service |
12 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys |
Cut Up |
06/10/1975 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over green with light green skirting, white window surrounds |
16/05/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7000 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7894 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/07/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7000 |
|
|
06/10/1975 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|