Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1040 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14446 Week
» 67462 Month
» 186989 Year
» 3213842 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6906 |
08/11/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37206 |
06/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/9R) |
37906 |
17/12/1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
08/11/1963 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
01/01/1999 |
Time in Service |
35 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
08/11/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/03/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
13/03/1970 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/11/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
13/03/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/11/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6906 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
13/03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
13/03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37206 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
17/12/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37906 |
|
|
01/01/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37906 |
|
|