Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1084 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31734 Week
» 130379 Month
» 333043 Year
» 3359896 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5692 |
23/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31412 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31512 |
30/10/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
23/03/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
11/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
19/09/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
19/09/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
19/09/1973 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 04/1977 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5692 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 293 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
31/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
05/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
04/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
19/09/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
19/09/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31412 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
30/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31512 |
|
|
31/05/2006 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31512 |
|
|
10/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|