Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2450 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33100 Week
» 131745 Month
» 334409 Year
» 3361262 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5669 |
24/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31410 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
30 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
A1A-A1A |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
269 |
To Service |
24/11/1960 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
30/06/2003 |
Time in Service |
42 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 12/2004 |
Information |
4-digit route indicators |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
24/11/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/12/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
03/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
18/03/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
18/03/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5669 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 269 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
10/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
18/03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
29/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31410 |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
30/06/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31410 |
|
|
12/2004 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|