Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1069 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31719 Week
» 130364 Month
» 333028 Year
» 3359881 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5638 |
11/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31214 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
11/08/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/08/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5638 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 238 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31214 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
15/05/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31214 |
|
|
10/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|