Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2381 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33031 Week
» 131676 Month
» 334340 Year
» 3361193 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5637 |
28/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31213 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31465 |
25/02/1985 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31565 |
09/08/1990 |
|
TOPS (31/4 (2)) |
31465 |
07/02/1993 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
28/07/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/08/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
26/03/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1977 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/07/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
26/03/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
02/06/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
10/10/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Not known |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5637 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 237 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
25/08/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
26/03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
23/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31213 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
25/02/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31465 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
09/08/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31565 |
|
|
07/02/1993 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31465 |
|
|