Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 2337 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15743 Week
» 68759 Month
» 188286 Year
» 3215139 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
TOPS (Tops) |
56075 |
06/04/1980 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
56 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Air Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Red Diamond | Other Details | Large horn grilles Body mounted step Protruding marker lights |
|
To Service |
06/04/1980 |
Withdrawn |
04/2004 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys |
Cut Up |
06/2004 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/04/1980 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 56075 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
02/08/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
22/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
05/06/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
04/09/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 56075 |
|
|
06/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|