Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 478 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31128 Week
» 129773 Month
» 332437 Year
» 3359290 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5549 |
10/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31131 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
10/09/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/09/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
27/03/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
01/1979 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
11/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/09/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
27/03/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1976 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
01/1979 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1981 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5549 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
27/03/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
18/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
12/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31131 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
12/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
11/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
22/03/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31131 |
|
|
04/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|