Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2457 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33107 Week
» 131752 Month
» 334416 Year
» 3361269 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5510 |
16/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (31/0) |
31010 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
16/05/1958 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/01/1969 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5510 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31010 |
|
|
09/05/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
10/07/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31010 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
12/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|
28/01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|