Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 142 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6449 Week
» 21563 Month
» 324753 Year
» 1546318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3662 20/06/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08507 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0820/06/1958
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 20/06/1958 to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Withdrawn 13/08/1993 off Reading (W.R.) (RG)
Time in Service 35 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys
Status Awaiting Scrapping

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) on 20/06/1958
41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 16/08/1958
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 16/09/1961
41A Tinsley on 26/04/1964
GD Gateshead on 04/10/1987
   Withdrawn on 13/08/1993


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/06/1958 To Service To service as D3662
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
16/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08507    
13/08/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 08507 from Reading (W.R.) (RG)    

prev prev