Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 126 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17929 Week
» 70945 Month
» 190472 Year
» 3217325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3660 |
31/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08505 |
07/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/05/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3660 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
30/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08505 |
|
|
29/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
24/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (GM) |
|
|
22/02/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08505 from Grangemouth (GM) |
|
|
26/03/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|