Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 44 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17847 Week
» 70863 Month
» 190390 Year
» 3217243 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3658 |
15/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08503 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/05/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3658 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Stourton (55B) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C) |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08503 |
|
|
20/09/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08503 from Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|