Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 289 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 11504 Week
» 2560 Month
» 348984 Year
» 3375837 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3634 |
03/11/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/11/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
03/11/1958 |
Power Unit ER85081 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3634 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
13/09/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
15/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
19/11/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3634 from Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
04/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|