Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 153 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 11368 Week
» 2424 Month
» 348848 Year
» 3375701 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3480 |
28/01/1958 |
|
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
36A |
|
Doncaster (New) |
on |
28/01/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/08/1968 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/04/1960 |
|
VHF Radio fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/01/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
28/01/1958 |
Power Unit ER81812 |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
29/03/1960 |
01/04/1960 |
Non Classified VHF Radio fitted
|
|
|
|
4 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
14/02/1962 |
31/03/1962 |
General |
|
|
|
46 days |
|
26,269 |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/01/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3480 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
29/03/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 29/03/1960. Dep: 01/04/1960. Work undertaken: VHF Radio fitted
Modification: VHF Radio fitted |
|
|
14/02/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1962. Dep: 31/03/1962. |
|
|
18/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3480 |
|
|
01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co.: Chesterfield |
|
|