Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 156 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 11371 Week
» 2427 Month
» 348851 Year
» 3375704 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3443 |
10/10/1957 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/10/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
10/10/1957 |
Power Unit ER80542 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/10/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3443 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/12/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3443 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|