Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 883 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14289 Week
» 67305 Month
» 186832 Year
» 3213685 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13226 |
02/07/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3226 |
24/08/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08158 |
12/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/07/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
02/07/1955 |
Power Unit IH3409 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/07/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13226 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
24/08/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3226 |
|
|
18/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
14/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
02/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08158 |
|
|
02/01/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08158 from Selhurst (SU) |
|
|
10/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|