Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 54 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17857 Week
» 70873 Month
» 190400 Year
» 3217253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13165 |
06/10/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3165 |
19/04/1958 |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
06/10/1955 |
Power Unit IH64315 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/10/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13165 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3165 |
|
|
26/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) (On Loan) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (16B) |
|
|
08/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3165 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|