Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2074 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19877 Week
» 72893 Month
» 192420 Year
» 3219273 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13148 |
15/07/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3148 |
29/11/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/07/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
15/07/1955 |
Power Unit IH64811 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/07/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13148 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B) |
|
|
01/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
08/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3148 |
|
|
05/03/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3148 |
|
|
03/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|