Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4139 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17545 Week
» 70561 Month
» 190088 Year
» 3216941 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13138 |
05/03/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3138 |
01/11/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/03/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
05/03/1955 |
Power Unit IH63870 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/03/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13138 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
18/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3138 |
|
|
02/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/04/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3138 from March (31B) |
|
|
08/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|