Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2109 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15515 Week
» 68531 Month
» 188058 Year
» 3214911 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13133 |
30/10/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3133 |
31/08/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08098 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/10/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13133 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3133 |
|
|
02/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
27/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
15/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
14/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08098 |
|
|
30/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08098 from Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
01/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|