Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 961 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14367 Week
» 67383 Month
» 186910 Year
» 3213763 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13066 |
24/10/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3066 |
10/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08053 |
07/09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/10/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/10/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13066 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3066 |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (1H) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
11/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
18/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
22/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (SW) |
|
|
07/09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08053 |
|
|
20/09/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
16/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (DN) |
|
|
11/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
03/1977 |
To Store |
To Store (Darlington) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
01/03/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08053 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
06/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|