Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 399 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17262 Week
» 8318 Month
» 354742 Year
» 3381595 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2424 |
29/04/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/04/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2424 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
30/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
05/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
19/11/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2424 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|