Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 277 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17140 Week
» 8196 Month
» 354620 Year
» 3381473 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2415 |
06/11/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/11/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2415 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
27/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
15/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2415 |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|