Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1967 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15373 Week
» 68389 Month
» 187916 Year
» 3214769 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2102 |
17/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03102 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/08/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2102 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
10/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
03/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
09/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03102 |
|
|
10/02/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03102 |
|
|
08/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|