Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2073 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19876 Week
» 72892 Month
» 192419 Year
» 3219272 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2099 |
15/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03099 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
15/07/1960 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
10/02/1976 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/07/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2099 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
23/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03099 |
|
|
10/02/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03099 |
|
|