Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 49 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17852 Week
» 70868 Month
» 190395 Year
» 3217248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2085 |
03/04/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/04/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2085 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
01/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
31/12/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2085 |
|
|
03/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|