Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2414 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15820 Week
» 68836 Month
» 188363 Year
» 3215216 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2082 |
19/02/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/02/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/02/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2082 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
01/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
19/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
31/12/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2082 |
|
|
09/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|